Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001878

EP1001878 - MACHINE FOR GLUING FOLDING CARTONS FOR PRODUCING FOLDING CARTONS FROM BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Jagenberg DIANA GmbH
Jagenbergstrasse 1
41468 Neuss / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PONS, Hubert
Salmstrasse 24
D-41472 Neuss / DE
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Franzen, Peter
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Intellectual Property
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]Franzen, Peter
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [2000/21]Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys.
Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99927823.701.06.1999
[2000/21]
WO1999EP03786
Priority number, dateDE199812498504.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19824985
DE199812882027.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19828820
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962701
Date:09.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001878
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001878
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B31B1/96, B31B1/04, B31B5/26
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   IT,   LI [2000/21]
TitleGerman:FALTSCHACHTELKLEBEMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FALTSCHACHTELN AUS ZUSCHNITTEN[2000/21]
English:MACHINE FOR GLUING FOLDING CARTONS FOR PRODUCING FOLDING CARTONS FROM BLANKS[2000/21]
French:MACHINE A COLLER LES BOITES PLIANTES POUR LA PRODUCTION DE BOITES PLIANTES A PARTIR DE DECOUPES[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/21]
17.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3139290  (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2284178  (WITTING GLAIVE INTERNATIONAL L [IE]) [A] * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 3 *;
 [A]US1972021  (LABOMBARDE HAROLD S)