Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1089926

EP1089926 - CONVEYOR SECTION ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTAINERS BEING FILLED WITH ITEMS OR BULK MATERIAL AT A FILLING STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knapp Logistik Automation Gesellschaft MBH
Günter-Knapp-Strasse 5-7
8075 Hart bei Graz / AT
[2001/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FREUDELSPERGER, Karl
Günter-Knapp-Strasse 5-7
A-8075 Hart bei Graz / AT
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Hanke, Hilmar , et al
Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08
81609 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Hanke, Hilmar , et al
Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08
81609 München / DE
Application number, filing date99927865.803.06.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999EP03857
Priority number, dateDE199812532805.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19825328
[2001/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9964331
Date:16.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1089926
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1089926
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/29, B65G47/88, B65G23/38, B65B43/56
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/15]
TitleGerman:FÖRDERSTRECKENANORDNUNG FÜR MIT ARTIKELN ODER SCHÜTTGUT ZU BEFÜLLENDE BEHÄLTER IN EINER FÜLLSTATION[2001/15]
English:CONVEYOR SECTION ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTAINERS BEING FILLED WITH ITEMS OR BULK MATERIAL AT A FILLING STATION[2001/15]
French:CONFIGURATION DE VOIE DE TRANSPORT POUR RECIPIENTS A REMPLIR D'ARTICLES OU DE PRODUITS EN VRAC DANS UN POSTE DE REMPLISSAGE[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2000National basic fee paid 
06.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/15]
18.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2003Fee for grant paid
29.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO9611157  (JOHANSSON PER [SE]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-5;
 [YA]US4962625  (JOHNSON JR A DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3,4;
 [A]US4991708  (FRANCIONI RENZO [IT]) [A] 1-4,6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3303332  (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *