EP1091903 - HAND RAIL GUIDE FOR AN ESCALATOR OR MOVING PAVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIETZ, Alexander Bachstrasse 5 D-45529 Hattingen / DE | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Spannagel, Hans-Achim, et al c/o Dipl.-Ing. W. Cichy Wilhelmstrasse 76 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2001/24] |
Former [2001/16] | Spannagel, Hans-Achim, et al Rechtsanwälte Spannagel & Döpp, Milsper Strasse 12 58256 Ennepetal / DE | Application number, filing date | 99927992.0 | 16.06.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999EP04148 | Priority number, date | DE1998129326 | 01.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829326 | [2001/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001606 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091903 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1091903 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/22 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B66B23/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/16] | Title | German: | HANDLAUFFÜHRUNG EINER ROLLTREPPE ODER EINES ROLLSTEIGES | [2001/16] | English: | HAND RAIL GUIDE FOR AN ESCALATOR OR MOVING PAVEMENT | [2001/16] | French: | GUIDAGE DE MAIN COURANTE D'UN ESCALIER ROULANT OU D'UN TROTTOIR ROULANT | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 27.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]FR2593794 (THYSSEN MAN AUFZUEGE) [X] 1,2,9,18,19 * page 4, line 32 - line 36 * * page 5, line 16 - line 31; figures 6,7 * [A] 3-5,7,8,10-17 [Y] 6; | [DXAY]DE29500800U (INVENTIO AG) [DX] 11 * page 3, line 19 - line 27 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 1,12 [Y] 14; | [YA]US5222786 (SOVIS JOHN F ET AL) [Y] 6,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 1,4,5,10,12,13; | [XA]DE3843090 (THYSSEN MAN AUFZUEGE) [X] 11,18,19 * column 4, line 9 - line 16 * * column 5, line 21 - line 42 * * figure 2B * [A] 2,12; | [A]US5634546 (OSTERMEIER JOERG ET AL) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * figures 3,6 * |