Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086326

EP1086326 - GATE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hart, Robert
23, Halsbury Road West Northolt
Middlesex UB5 4PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hart, Robert
23, Halsbury Road West
Northolt, Middlesex UB5 4PL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Gray, James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Gray, James , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99928057.118.06.1999
[2001/13]
WO1999GB01935
Priority number, dateGB1998001317219.06.1998         Original published format: GB 9813172
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9966237
Date:23.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1086326
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1086326
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16K3/08, F16K3/10
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/13]
TitleGerman:SCHIEBERVENTIL[2001/13]
English:GATE VALVE[2001/13]
French:CLAPET OBTURATEUR[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2001National basic fee paid 
15.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
20.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2005Fee for grant paid
11.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2001
30.06.200204   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
FR13.04.2005
IT13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
GB13.07.2005
DE14.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
IT13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
FR30.06.2005
GB13.07.2005
DE14.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
Former [2008/18]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
IT13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
GB13.07.2005
DE14.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
Former [2006/35]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
GB13.07.2005
DE14.07.2005
ES24.07.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
NL13.04.2005
ES24.07.2005
Former [2006/13]AT13.04.2005
BE13.04.2005
FI13.04.2005
Former [2005/52]FI13.04.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4532961  (WALTON HERBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,22 * abstract * [A] 13;
 [XA]US2254268  (CHURCH WALTER L) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4 * [A] 24;
 [X]US1404028  (JONES LAWRENCE R) [X] 1-3,11,12,21,22 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 98 - line 103 *;
 [X]JPS5514348  ;
 [X]US1951121  (BABCOCK IRA J) [X] 1-4,8-10,21,30,31,35-38 * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]GB345369  (CHARLES HENRY SCHMALZ) [X] 1-3,23-27,29 * figures 1-28 *;
 [AD]GB2277573  (FSSL LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,17-20 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0392383  (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1,17-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US1969375  (LAURENT MILTON P) [A] 1,24 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US3626981  (BAUER-NILSEN OLAV) [A] 1,30 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800409), vol. 004, no. 045, Database accession no. (M - 006), [X] 1-3,15,16,21,22 * abstract *
by applicantUS917970
 US3590872
 GB2277573
 GB2300896
 US5284320