EP1097681 - DEVICE FOR LASER THERAPY IN OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VARIANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Utar International Ltd. White Park House White Park Road P.O. Box 806E Bridgetown / BB | [2002/12] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Tasr Limited 94 Dowdeswell Street, Island of New Providence, P.O. Box N-7521 Nassau / BS | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANIKINA, Elena Borisovna Leninsky prospekt, 123-1-307 Moscow, 117513 / RU | 02 /
TURKOV, Jury Grigorievich Mozhaiskoe shosse, 17-177 Moscow, 121471 / RU | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2001/19] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99928270.0 | 11.06.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999RU00196 | Priority number, date | RU19980110987 | 11.06.1998 Original published format: RU 98110987 | [2001/19] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963916 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097681 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097681 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 16.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/067, A61F9/008 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A61N5/06 (EP);
A61F9/008 (EP);
A61N5/067 (EP);
A61F2009/00865 (EP);
A61F2009/00868 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/19] | A61F9/00, A61N5/067 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE LASERTHERAPIE IN DER OPHTALMOLOGIE UND VARIANTEN | [2003/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR LASER THERAPY IN OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VARIANTS | [2001/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE THERAPIE LASER EN OPHTALMOLOGIE ET VARIANTES | [2001/19] |
Former [2001/19] | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE LASERTHERAPIE IN DER OPHTALMOLOGIE UND ÄHNLICHEN GEBIETEN | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2001 | Translation filed | 11.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.05.2004 | [2008/18] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9502356 (PHOENIX LASER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 26 *; | [A]DE4442071 (GEHM ULRICH DR [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * | International search | [A]RU2092140 (VASILEV MIKHAIL G [RU], et al); | [A]RU2102951 (PANKOV OLEG PAVLOVICH) | [A] - KATSNELSON L.A. et al., Primenenie Nizkoenergeticheskogo Infrakrasnogo Lazernogo Izluchenya Dlya Uluchshenya Krovosnabzhenya i Povyshenya Funktsii Zrenya u Bolnykh s Zabolevanyami Setchatki, M., MNIIGB im. Gelmgoltsa, 1996, pages 3-5. |