blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1078315

EP1078315 - REMOTELY CONTROLLED POWER SUPPLY IN AN ELECTRONIC LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pricer AB
Kristallen
754 51 Uppsala / SE
[2001/09]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSSON, Lars
Blomgatan 10A
S-752 31 Uppsala / SE
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Lindgren, Anders
BRANN AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Lindgren, Anders
Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7
751 43 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date99928302.112.05.1999
[2001/09]
WO1999SE00821
Priority number, dateSE1998000171915.05.1998         Original published format: SE 9801719
[2001/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9960473
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078315
Date:28.02.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078315
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE25.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/147
[2001/09]
CPC:
G06F3/147 (EP,US); G06Q20/201 (EP,US); G09G2330/02 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US); G09G2380/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/09]
TitleGerman:FERNGESTEUERTE STROMVERSORGUNG IN EINEM ELEKTRONISCHEN ETIKETT[2001/09]
English:REMOTELY CONTROLLED POWER SUPPLY IN AN ELECTRONIC LABEL[2001/09]
French:ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE COMMANDEE A DISTANCE DANS UNE ETIQUETTE ELECTRONIQUE[2011/13]
Former [2001/09]ALIMENTATION D'ENERGIE COMMANDEE A DISTANCE DANS UNE ETIQUETTE ELECTRONIQUE
Entry into regional phase25.11.2000National basic fee paid 
25.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
25.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
12.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2011Fee for grant paid
06.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2006
Opposition(s)21.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
20.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5689239  (TURNER LEIGH HOLBROOK [SG], et al);
 [A]US5723854  (BERNEY JEAN CLAUDE [CH]);
 [A]US5544041  (NEKOMOTO YOSHIHIKO [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.