Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1087775

EP1087775 - PREVENTING CEREBRAL INFARCTION THROUGH ADMINISTRATION OF ADP-RECEPTOR ANTIPLATELET AND ANTIHYPERTENSIVE DRUGS IN COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/48]For all designated states
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
For all designated states
Sanofi-Aventis
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
For all designated states
SANOFI-SYNTHELABO
174, Avenue de France
75013 Paris / FR
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CONIGLIO, Anthony, A.
35 Centerville Road
Branchburg, NJ 08876 / US
02 / PLAT, Francis, R.
2 Seminole Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
03 / BLUMENTHAL, Melvin, S.
1472 Greenmeadows Road
Yardley, PA 19067 / US
04 / Cazaubon, Catherine
76, rue Jean-Francois Champollion
34090 Montpellier / FR
05 / Herbert, Jean-Marc
10, rue de l'Amandier
31170 Tournefeuille / FR
06 / Nisato, Dino
2, rue Terre Rouge
34680 Saint Georges d'Orques / FR
 [2004/17]
Former [2002/34]01 / cONIGLIO, Anthony, A.
35 Centerville Road
Branchburg, NJ 08876 / US
02 / PLAT, Francis, R.
2 Seminole Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
03 / BLUMENTHAL, Melvin, S.
1472 Greenmeadows Road
Yardley, PA 19067 / US
Former [2001/14]01 / CONIGLIO, Anthony, A.
35 Centerville Road
Branchburg, NJ 08876 / US
02 / PLAT, Francis, R.
2 Seminole Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
03 / BLUMENTHAL, Melvin, S.
1472 Greenmeadows Road
Yardley, PA 19067 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/14]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99928498.709.06.1999
[2001/14]
WO1999US12934
Priority number, dateUS19980089650P17.06.1998         Original published format: US 89650 P
[2001/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9965500
Date:23.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1087775
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999
[2001/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1087775
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/675, A61K31/55, A61K31/505, A61K31/44, A61K31/47, A61K31/41, A61K31/415, A61K31/40, A61P9/10
[2005/04]
Former International [2001/14]A61K31/675, A61K31/55, A61K31/505, A61K31/44, A61K31/47, A61K31/41, A61K31/415, A61K31/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/14]
TitleGerman:VORBEUGUNG DES HIRNINFARKTS DURCH KOMBINIERTE VERABREICHUNG VON ADP-REZEPTOR ANTIBLUTPLÄTTCHEN UND ANTIHYPERTENSIVEN MEDIKAMENTEN[2005/27]
English:PREVENTING CEREBRAL INFARCTION THROUGH ADMINISTRATION OF ADP-RECEPTOR ANTIPLATELET AND ANTIHYPERTENSIVE DRUGS IN COMBINATION[2001/14]
French:PREVENTION DE L'INFARCTUS CEREBRAL PAR ADMINISTRATION D'UNE COMBINAISON D'UN ANTI-AGREGANT PLAQUETTAIRE BLOQUANT LES RECEPTEURS D'ADP ET D'UN MEDICAMENT ANTIHYPERTENSEUR[2001/14]
Former [2001/14]VORBEUGUNG DES HIRNSCHLAGS DURCH KOMBINIERTE VERABREICHUNG VON ADP-REZEPTOR ANTIBLUTPLÄTTCHEN UND ANTIHYPERTENSIVEN MEDIKAMENTEN
Entry into regional phase12.12.2000National basic fee paid 
12.12.2000Search fee paid 
12.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.12.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/14]
17.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2005Fee for grant paid
29.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30]
Request for further processing for:27.01.2004Request for further processing filed
27.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0463636  (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [X] 1,3,5,7,9,12 * claim 1 * * page 3, line 25 - line 29 * * page 3, line 14 - line 15 * * page 8, line 19 - line 20 * * Example * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]EP0555042  (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,9 * page 2, line 1 - line 14 * * page 3, line 8 - line 9 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]  CHAN C-C ET AL, "POTENTIATION OF THE INHIBITORY EFFECT OF A THROMBOXANE A-2 ANTAGONIST L-640035 3 HYDROXYMETHYLDIBENZO-B F-THIEPIN 5 5-DIOXIDE ON ARTERIAL THROMBOSIS FORMATION IN RABBIT BY THE ANGIOTENSIN CONVERTING ENZYME INHIBITOR ENALAPRIL", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1985), vol. 110, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 323 - 328, XP008009738 [Y] 1-15 * page 323, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 325, column L, paragraph 3.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(85)90559-X
 [PA]  TAUBERT G ET AL, "Aspirin improves the ACE inhibitor effect on prognosis after myocardial infarction.", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, XXth Congress of the European Society of Cardiology;Vienna, Austria; August 22-26, 1998, (199808), vol. 19, no. ABST. SUPPL., ISSN 0195-668X, page 51, XP008009740 [PA] * Abstract *
 [A]  VAN WIJNGAARDEN J ET AL, "Effects of acetylsalicylic acid on peripheral hemodynamics in patients with chronic heart failure treated with angiotensin-converting enzyme inhibitors.", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0160-2446, pages 240 - 245, XP008009739 [A] * Entire document *
 [A]  CANNON, CHRISTOPHER P., "Advances in the medical management of acute coronary syndromes", CURRENT OPINION IN CARDIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 13, pages 327 - 347, XP008009741 [A] * page 334, left-hand column, "Clopidogrel" * * page 340, left-hand column, "Angiotensin-converting enzyme" *
 [A]  HANSSON L ET AL, "Effects of intensive blood-pressure lowering and low-dose aspirin in patients with hypertension: principal results of the Hypertension Optimal Treatment (HOT) randomised trial", LANCET, XX, XX, (19980613), vol. 351, no. 9118, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1755 - 1762, XP004265381 [A] * Entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(98)04311-6
International search[X]US5661150  (SHIRASAKI YASUFUMI [JP], et al)
 [Y]  - DATABASE EMBASE ON STN, AN 84252725, WITYK et al., "Ischemic Stroke: Today and Tomorrow"; & CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, 1994, Vol. 22, No. 8, pages 1278-1293.,
ExaminationGB2038178