Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1104430

EP1104430 - ANSA GROUP-4-METAL BIS (.MU.-SUBSTITUTED) ALUMINUM METALLOCENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
[2008/38]
Former [2002/30]For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies, Inc.
Washington Street, 1790 Building
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Former [2001/23]For all designated states
THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
2030 Dow Center
Midland, Michigan 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Eugene, Y.
2101 Eastlawn Drive No. 9
Midland, MI 48642 / US
 [2001/23]
Representative(s)Burford, Anthony Frederick , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/23]Burford, Anthony Frederick , et al
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date99928619.811.06.1999
[2001/23]
WO1999US13347
Priority number, dateUS19980096088P11.08.1998         Original published format: US 96088 P
US19980096800P17.08.1998         Original published format: US 96800 P
US19980100490P16.09.1998         Original published format: US 100490 P
US19980104229P14.10.1998         Original published format: US 104229 P
US19990125444P22.03.1999         Original published format: US 125444 P
[2001/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0009524
Date:24.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1104430
Date:06.06.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000
[2001/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1104430
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F17/00, C08F10/00
[2001/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/23]
TitleGerman:ANSA GRUPPE-4-METALL BIS(.MU.-ALUMINIUM) -SUBSTITUIERTE METALLOCENE[2002/16]
English:ANSA GROUP-4-METAL BIS (.MU.-SUBSTITUTED) ALUMINUM METALLOCENES[2001/23]
French:METALLOCENES D'ALUMINIUM ET DE METAL DU GROUPE 4 ANSA BIS(.MU.-SUBSTITUES)[2001/23]
Former [2001/23]ANSA GRUPPE-4-METALL BIS(.MU.-ALUMINIUM) -SUBSTITUIERTE METALLOCENES
Entry into regional phase12.03.2001National basic fee paid 
12.03.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
19.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2002Fee for grant paid
07.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
FR18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
IT18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
CY11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
LU11.06.2003
ES27.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2006/32]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
FR18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
CY11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
LU11.06.2003
ES27.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
Former [2005/02]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
CY11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
LU11.06.2003
ES27.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
CY11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
LU11.06.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/36]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
CY11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/29]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
IE11.06.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/05]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
DK18.03.2003
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
Former [2003/51]AT18.12.2002
BE18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
FI18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
PT18.03.2003
SE18.03.2003
Former [2003/39]AT18.12.2002
CH18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
LI18.12.2002
SE18.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT18.12.2002
GR18.12.2002
SE18.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR18.12.2002
SE18.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE18.03.2003
Cited inInternational searchJPH05230134  [ ] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS);
 [A]EP0573403  (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0582268  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - EWEN, J.A., "propylene polymerizations with metallocene/teal/trityl tetrakis (pentafluorophenyl) aluminate mixtures", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19951113), vol. 123, no. 20, Database accession no. 257485, XP002114213 [A] 1 * abstract *
 [D]  - STUD. SURF. SCI. CATAL., (1994), vol. 89, pages 405 - 410,
 [A]  - SUGIMOTO, R. ET AL., "preparation of highly stereoregular polyolefins with wide molecular weight distribution", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940207), vol. 120, no. 6, Database accession no. 55325, XP002114214 [A] 1 * abstract *