Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095519

EP1095519 - REGION-BASED SCALABLE IMAGE CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FI, LU
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digital Accelerator Corporation
Suite 904, 1055 Dunsmuir Street
Vancouver, British Columbia V7X 1J1 / CA
[2007/24]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Digital Accelerator Corporation
Suite 904, 1055 Dunsmuir Street
Vancouver, British Columbia V7X 1J1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Meng
3027 Laurel Street
Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 3T6 / CA
02 / YANG, Xue, Dong
3446 Rideout Bay
Regina, Saskatchewan S4S 7C3 / CA
03 / QU, Li
318-165 East 6th Street
North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 1P / CA
04 / SIMON, Brent
2110 West Keith Road,North Vancouver
British Columbia V7P 1Z3 / CA
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Potter, Julian Mark , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99928975.415.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999CA00641
Priority number, dateUS19980093124P15.07.1998         Original published format: US 93124 P
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004721
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095519
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095519
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H04N7/30
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEREICHSBASIERTE SKALIERBARE BILDKODIERUNG[2003/49]
English:REGION-BASED SCALABLE IMAGE CODING[2001/18]
French:CODAGE D'IMAGE AGRANDISSABLE BASE SUR LA REGION[2001/18]
Former [2001/18]BEREICHBASIERTE SKALIERBARE BILDKODIERUNG
Entry into regional phase14.02.2001National basic fee paid 
14.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
15.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
17.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/49]
02.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/15]
11.11.2004Fee for grant paid
11.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21]
Request for further processing for:11.11.2004Request for further processing filed
11.11.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.05.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
15.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
18.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2002
31.07.200406   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2005
31.07.200507   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2005
31.07.200608   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.06.2007
BE13.06.2007
CH13.06.2007
CY13.06.2007
DK13.06.2007
FI13.06.2007
IT13.06.2007
LI13.06.2007
NL13.06.2007
LU15.07.2007
IE16.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
SE13.09.2007
GR14.09.2007
ES24.09.2007
PT13.11.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/45]AT13.06.2007
BE13.06.2007
CH13.06.2007
DK13.06.2007
IT13.06.2007
LI13.06.2007
NL13.06.2007
IE16.07.2007
MC31.07.2007
SE13.09.2007
GR14.09.2007
ES24.09.2007
PT13.11.2007
Former [2008/22]AT13.06.2007
BE13.06.2007
CH13.06.2007
DK13.06.2007
IT13.06.2007
LI13.06.2007
NL13.06.2007
MC31.07.2007
SE13.09.2007
GR14.09.2007
ES24.09.2007
PT13.11.2007
Former [2008/21]AT13.06.2007
BE13.06.2007
CH13.06.2007
LI13.06.2007
NL13.06.2007
SE13.09.2007
GR14.09.2007
ES24.09.2007
PT13.11.2007
Former [2008/18]AT13.06.2007
BE13.06.2007
CH13.06.2007
LI13.06.2007
NL13.06.2007
SE13.09.2007
ES24.09.2007
PT13.11.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9819273  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 6, line 4 - line 14 * * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0466475  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-29 * abstract *;
 [A]US5748903  (AGARWAL ROHIT [US]) [A] 1-29 * column 18, line 45 - column 19, line 36 *
 [XA]  - FRAJKA T ET AL, "PROGRESSIVE IMAGE CODING WITH SPATIALLY VARIABLE RESOLUTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING,US,LOS ALAMITOS, CA: IEEE, ISBN 0-8186-8184-5, page 53-56, XP000792714 [X] 1,2,5,6,9,11,14-16,19,20,23,25,28,29 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] * [A] 3,4,7,8,10,12,13,17,18,21,22,24,26,27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.647382