Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007928

EP1007928 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING SCREWED CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Löffler, Thomas
Rosenheimer Strasse 62
83714 Miesbach / DE
[2000/24]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Kern, Gerbert
Okenstrasse 11
77652 Offenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Kern, Gerbert
Okenstrasse 11
77652 Offenburg / DE
Application number, filing date99929064.630.04.1999
[2000/24]
WO1999DE01279
Priority number, dateDE199811930130.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19819301
[2000/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9957532
Date:11.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1007928
Date:14.06.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007928
Date:03.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search reportEP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01L5/24, F16B31/02
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN VON SCHRAUBVERBINDUNGEN[2000/24]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING SCREWED CONNECTIONS[2000/24]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONTROLER DES ASSEMBLAGES VISSES[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2000National basic fee paid 
25.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
16.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2002Fee for grant paid
12.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200103   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT03.07.2002
SE03.10.2002
[2008/18]
Former [2003/03]SE03.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9835791  (LOEFFLER THOMAS [DE]) [PA] 1,5 * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 4; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]FR1512090  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3943819  (CHARRON CHARLES S) [A] 1,5 * abstract *