blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1087952

EP1087952 - BENZAZOLE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2003/11]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [2003/10]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Vienna / AT
Former [2001/32]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [2001/14]For:BE  CH  CY  DE  DK  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT  SE  LI 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / BOUVIER, Jacques
Rue des Parcs 2
CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH
02 / CHRISTINAZ, Catherine
Rue du Lac
CH-1544 Gletterens / CH
03 / FROELICH, Olivier
19, Chemin des Pêcheurs
F-68680 Kembs / FR
 [2001/14]
Representative(s)de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al
Novartis International AG
Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/12]de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al
Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2003/20]Grubb, Philip William, et al
Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2001/14]Becker, Konrad, et al
Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date99929244.416.06.1999
[2001/14]
WO1999EP04173
Priority number, dateCH1998000132018.06.1998         Original published format: CH 132098
[2001/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9965886
Date:23.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1087952
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1087952
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C07D277/64, C07D277/84, C07D263/58, A01N43/78, A01N43/76
[2001/14]
CPC:
C07D263/58 (EP,US); A01N43/76 (EP,US); A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A61P33/14 (EP); C07D277/64 (EP,US); C07D277/84 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/14]
TitleGerman:BENZAZOL-VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2001/14]
English:BENZAZOLE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE[2001/14]
French:COMPOSES DE BENZAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATIONS[2001/14]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2000National basic fee paid 
02.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/14]
17.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2004Fee for grant paid
29.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH05294828  ;
 [XY]JPH09175926  ;
 [X]DE2053715  (AGFA-GEVAERT AG) [X] 1,2 * page 6, table, compound no. 9 *;
 [AD]US3624204  (STEPANOV MIKHAIL KONSTANTINOVI, et al) [AD] 1,4-8* claim - *;
 [X]FR2228090  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 58, line 15 *;
 [X]DE2429562  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED) [X] 1,2 * page 6,, table I, compound no. 3;; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]CH565164  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 29 - column 9, line 68 *;
 [X]DE2548184  (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [X] 1-3 * page 12, starting compound for preparation of compound 4 *;
 [X]CH585214  (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1,2 * colum 1, formula (Ia); column 6, table, compound no. 8 *;
 [AD]DE2756360  (ROHM & HAAS) [AD] 1,4-8 * claims 1,10 *;
 [AD]EP0022653  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [AD] 1,4-8 * claims 1,10-12 *;
 [AD]US4356180  (MCGOVERN TERRENCE P, et al) [AD] 1,4-8 * claim - *;
 [X]US4428957  (BORAY JOSEPH C [AU], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 1 *;
 [X]DE3528032  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, example 13 *;
 [AD]EP0467045  (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,4-8 * claims 1,6-9 *;
 [X]US5601963  (FILOSA MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 8, example I, compound (d) *;
 [X]WO9811095  (CELLTECH THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 24, line 3 - line 12 *;
 [X]  - I. B. TARAPOREWALA, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1991), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 39 - 42, XP002119286 [X] 1-3 * page 40, compound no. 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)71212-3
 [X]  - H. BREDERECK ET AL., CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1968), vol. 101, pages 4048 - 56, XP002119287 [X] 1,2 * page 4052, table 2, last three compounds *
 [X]  - H. CHIKASHITA ET AL., BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1988), vol. 61, no. 10, pages 3637 - 48, XP002119288 [X] 1,2 * page 3637, scheme 1; page 3639, table 2 *
 [X]  - R. BOSSIO ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1996), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 471 - 4, XP002119289 [X] 1,2 * page 474, line 1 - line 3 *
 [X]  - A. CHAUDHURI ET AL., INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (197304), vol. 11, pages 315 - 7, XP002119290 [X] 1,2 * page 315, right-hand column, "experimental Procedure" to page 316, left-hand column, line 46 *
 [X]  - A. GASCO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1968), vol. 24, pages 5569 - 74, XP002119291 [X] 1,2 * table 1, compound (I) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(68)88154-2
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19590325), vol. 53, no. 6, Database accession no. 5246c, column 5246, XP002119292 [X] 1,2 * disclosure of 3-acetyl-6-fluoro-2(3H)- benzoxazolone *
    [ ] - Z. ECKSTEIN ET AL., PRZEMYSL CHEM., (1958), vol. 37, pages 418 - 21
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940216), vol. 18, no. 93, Database accession no. (C - 1166), & JP05294828 A 19931109 (KANEBO LTD.) [XY] 1,4-8 * abstract *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 97, no. 11, & JP09175926 A 19970708 (KANEBO LTD.) [XY] 1,4-8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.