Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101193

EP1101193 - OPEN-WORKED ANTENNA FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes
50, avenue Jean Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / FLETOUT, Christophe
353, rue Tertres
F-45760 Boigny sur Bionne / FR
02 / THEVENOT, Benoît
60, allée Maurice Ravel
F-45160 Olivet / FR
03 / BREL, Marie-Cécile
114, rue du Petit Port
F-45000 Orléans / FR
04 / LETOURNEL, Jean-Luc
127, rue du Cormier
F-45160 Olivet / FR
05 / BORG, Norbert
1, rue des Thuyas
F-45240 La Ferté Saint Aubin / FR
06 / DUPUIS, Nathalie
44, rue de l'Epine
F-45380 Chaingy / FR
07 / MANDE, Mickael
9, rue Lazare Carnot
F-45100 Orléans / FR
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Macquet, Christophe
Schlumberger Systèmes, 50 avenue Jean Jaurès, BP 620-12
92542 Montrouge Cédex / FR
[2001/21]
Application number, filing date99929418.406.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999FR01633
Priority number, dateFR1998000860406.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808604
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0002160
Date:13.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101193
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101193
Date:05.06.2002
Language:FR
[2002/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/23]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:PERFORIERTE ANTENNE FÜR IC KARTE UND IC KARTE MIT SOLCHER ANTENNE[2001/21]
English:OPEN-WORKED ANTENNA FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD COMPRISING SAME[2001/21]
French:ANTENNE AJOUREE POUR CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE, ET CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE ANTENNE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2000National basic fee paid 
24.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/21]
19.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2002Fee for grant paid
08.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE19640260  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 29; figure 1 * [A] 2-5;
 [A]WO9705569  (AUSTRIA CARD [AT], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 20, line 17 - line 32; figure 11 *