Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095358

EP1095358 - METHOD FOR MODELLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS OR SCENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRANCE TELECOM
6 Place d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE
10, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
FRANCE TELECOM
6, Place d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE
10, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / LERAY, Pascal
27, L'Etang de la Motte
F-35590 Saint Gilles / FR
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Novagraaf Technologies
12 Place des Halles Saint Louis
56100 Lorient / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Novagraaf Technologies Cabinet Ballot 4, Rue Général Hoche
56100 Lorient / FR
Former [2002/31]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Cabinet Ballot 4 rue du Général Hoche BP 855
56100 Lorient / FR
Former [2001/18]Ballot, Paul , et al
Cabinet Ballot, 4 Rue Général Hoche
56100 Lorient / FR
Application number, filing date99929456.409.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999FR01677
Priority number, dateFR1998000931616.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809316
[2001/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0004503
Date:27.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095358
Date:02.05.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095358
Date:01.10.2003
Language:FR
[2003/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06T17/00
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2003/40]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MODELLIERUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN ODER DREIDIMENSIONALEN SZENEN[2001/18]
English:METHOD FOR MODELLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS OR SCENES[2001/18]
French:PROCEDE DE MODELISATION D'OBJETS OU DE SCENES 3D[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2001National basic fee paid 
06.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
19.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2003Fee for grant paid
08.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2744586  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]US5714997  (ANDERSON DAVID P [US]) [Y] 1-8 * column 13, line 63 - column 15, line 11; figure 9 *;
 [A]US5309522  (DYE ROBERT [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9735439  (REAL TIME GEOMETRY CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 36, paragraph VII * * page 38, paragraph IX *
 [A]  - LERAY P, "New advances in neuro-visual simulation and symbolic extraction for real world computing, 3D image analysis and 3D object digitization", ELEVENTH EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON GRAPHICS HARDWARE, PROCEEDINGS OF ELEVENTH EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON GRAPHICS HARDWARE, POITIERS, FRANCE, 26-27 AUG. 1996, 1996, Yorktown Heights, NY, USA, IBM T J Watson Res. Center, USA, pages 79 - 89, XP002100910 [A] 1-8 * page 81, column R, paragraph 2.2. *
 [A]  - JONES G A, "CONSTRAINT, OPTIMIZATION, AND HIERARCHY: REVIEWING STEREOSCOPIC CORRESPONDENCE OF COMPLEX FEATURES", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING, (199701), vol. 65, no. 1, pages 57 - 78, XP000685839 [A] 1 * page 60, column L, paragraph DISPAR.. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cviu.1996.0482