Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091770

EP1091770 - WOUND DRESSINGS AND MATERIALS SUITABLE FOR USE THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.06.2009  [2009/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConvaTec Limited
GDC First Avenue Deeside Industrial Park Deeside
Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB
[2006/15]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Acordis Speciality Fibres Limited
P.O. Box 5, Station Road
Spondon, Derby DE21 7BP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PATEL, Champa
13 Culworth Court Foleshill Road
Coventry CV6 5JY / GB
02 / BRAY, Roger
6 Hollinwell Close Whitestone
Nuneaton Warwickshire CV11 6TU / GB
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
First Floor, Atrium Court
15-17 Jockey's Fields
London WC1R 4BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/45]Mays, Julie , et al
Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Former [2004/23]Hale, Stephen Geoffrey , et al
Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Former [2001/16]Hale, Stephen Geoffrey , et al
JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn
London WC1V 7DP / GB
Application number, filing date99929527.201.07.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999GB02093
Priority number, dateGB1998001427301.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814273
GB1998002466710.11.1998         Original published format: GB 9824667
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001425
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091770
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/28
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/16]
TitleGerman:WUNDAUFLAGEN UND DAFÜR VERWENDBARE MATERIALEN[2001/16]
English:WOUND DRESSINGS AND MATERIALS SUITABLE FOR USE THEREIN[2001/16]
French:PANSEMENTS ET MATERIAUX CONSTITUTIFS ADAPTES[2001/16]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2001National basic fee paid 
22.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2008
02.10.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/23]
26.01.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/23]
Divisional application(s)EP08017432.9  / EP2036581
Request for further processing for:21.09.2006Request for further processing filed
21.09.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.10.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200709   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2007
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE
Date:06.11.2008
[2009/02]
Cited inInternational search[X]US4579943  (KAMIDE KENJI ET AL) [X] 1-22 * column 4, line 1 - line 45 * * example - * * table - *;
 [X]WO9312275  (COURTAULDS PLC) [X] 1-6,9-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 23 * * examples 1,4,5,15,20 *;
 [X]US4405324  (CRUZ JR MAMERTO M) [X] 1-6 * table 4 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [X]US4256877  (KARLSSON ALF H ET AL) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 16 - line 45 *