Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021378

EP1021378 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR SEWAGE AND WASTEWATER TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WRC PLC
Frankland Road, Blagrove Swindon
Wiltshire SN5 8YF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
WRC PLC
Frankland Road, Blagrove
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 8YF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hobson, John
69 Avon Road
Devizes, Wiltshire SN10 1PS / GB
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew , et al
Graham Watt & Co. LLP
St. Botolph's House
7-9 St. Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew , et al
Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date99929595.907.07.1999
[2000/30]
WO1999GB02176
Priority number, dateGB1998001459107.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814591
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001623
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021378
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021378
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C02F3/30, C02F3/24, C02F3/12
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/19]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABWASSERBEHANDLUNG[2000/30]
English:APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR SEWAGE AND WASTEWATER TREATMENT[2000/30]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX USEES[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2000National basic fee paid 
05.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
13.11.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2003Fee for grant paid
24.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]GB976805  (SCHREIBER AUGUST) [X] 1-3,16,21-25 * THE WHOLE DOCUMENT, ESPECIALLY ACCORDING TO FIGURES 5 TO 10 *;
 [A]WO9113033  (ZAAL THEODORUS SIMON [NL]) [A] 5,9,16,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4259185  (MIXON JAMES A) [A] 1-3,16,23-25 * column W *;
 [A]US4659464  (LONG JR CHARLES A [US]) [A] 1-3,15,21,23-25,33 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5156742  (STRUEWING JOHN W [US]) [A] 1,4,23,32 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5352357  (PERRY CLIFF R [US]) [A] 1,4,23,32;
 [A]US5234595  (DIGREGORIO DAVID [US], et al) [A] 4,32 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4042510  (SULLINS JOHN K) [A] 5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4482510  (KHUDENKO BORIS M [US]) [A] 5 * the whole document *