Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100860

EP1100860 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION HAVING A PLASMA-INDUCED, WATER-SOLUBLE COATING AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEVERS, Jean
Heide 17
B-1840 Steenhuffel / BE
02 / FRANCE, Paul, Amaat
8331 Summerbridge Way
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
03 / DATTA, Saswati
11636 Plumhill Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US
04 / RADOMYSELSKIY, Arseniy V.
2940 Portsmouth Avenue 33
Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2001/21]Peet, Jillian Wendy , et al
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date99929641.123.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999IB01311
Priority number, dateUS19980094555P29.07.1998         Original published format: US 94555 P
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0006686
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100860
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT PLASMAINDUZIERTEN WASSERLÖSLICHEN BESCHICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2001/21]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITION HAVING A PLASMA-INDUCED, WATER-SOLUBLE COATING AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAME[2001/21]
French:COMPOSITION DETERGENTE A ENROBAGE HYDROSOLUBLE PRODUIT PAR PLASMA ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2001National basic fee paid 
15.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
21.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/32]
05.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9721497  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-5,10-25 * claims 1-14,22-30 * * examples B4-B6,B8,B10-B14 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 15, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]GB1269018  (PROGIL [FR]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-10 * * example 4 * * page 1, line 8 - line 29 * * page 1, line 67 - page 2, line 14 *;
 [A]US4756844  (WALLES WILHELM E [US], et al) [A] 1,6-10 * claims 1-15,21-24 * * column 1, line 9 - line 17 *;
 [A]EP0716144  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-8,10-14,16 * claims 1-4,11 * * example - *;
 [A]EP0271992  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-7,9,14,15 * claims 1-4 *