Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038665

EP1038665 - DECORATIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Kazuhiro, Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
02 / Ito, Kimio, Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
 [2016/16]
Former [2000/39]01 / Takahashi, Kazuhiro, Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
02 / Ito, Kimio, Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2000/39]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99929839.114.07.1999
[2000/39]
WO1999JP03806
Priority number, dateJP1998021491914.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21491998
JP1998025695010.09.1998         Original published format: JP 25695098
JP1998030843129.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30843198
JP1998031161802.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31161898
JP1998033028520.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33028598
[2000/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003874
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038665
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038665
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:B32B33/00, B44F9/02, B41M7/00, B44C5/04
[2009/04]
Former International [2002/29]B32B33/00, B44F9/02, B41M7/00
Former International [2000/39]B32B33/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2015/35]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:DEKORMATERIAL[2000/39]
English:DECORATIVE MATERIAL[2000/39]
French:MATERIAU DECORATIF[2015/46]
Former [2000/39]MATIERE DECORATIVE
Entry into regional phase13.04.2000Translation filed 
13.04.2000National basic fee paid 
13.04.2000Search fee paid 
13.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
30.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.03.2016Fee for grant paid
03.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11005310.5  / EP2402157
EP11005311.3  / EP2402158
EP11005312.1  / EP2402159
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2009
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
28.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH07186514  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1,2,16-28 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0697295  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 7-15,30,31 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 52; figure 1; claim - *;
 [YA]WO9808682  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 7-15,30,31 * the whole document * [A] 16-28;
 EP0872338  [ ] (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP])
International search[A]JPS6012106B  ;
 [A]JPS6464834  (FUJITSU LTD)
by applicantJPH09111055
 JPH0577371