EP1079867 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A POWDER COMPONENT FOR CEMENT FOR MEDICAL USE, USE OF SUCH POWDER COMPONENT AND SUCH POWDER COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomet Orthopaedics Switzerland GmbH Gewerbegebiet Widalmi 12 3216 Ried b. Kerzers / CH | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Biomet Merck GmbH Gewerbegebiet Widalmi 12 3216 Ried b. Kerzers / CH | ||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Norrfors s.a.r.l. 38, Boulevard Josep II 1840 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Bone Support AB Forskaregatan 1 275 37 Sjöbo / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIDGREN, Lars, ke, Alvar Bredgatan 9B S-222 21 Lund / SE | [2004/44] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
LIDGREN, Lars, ke, Alvar Örnvägen 35 S-227 31 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl Heinz, et al Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Wagner, Karl Heinz, et al H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 99930023.9 | 27.05.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999SE00896 | Priority number, date | SE19980001901 | 29.05.1998 Original published format: SE 9801901 | [2001/10] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962570 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079867 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079867 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/08 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61K49/0438 (EP,US);
A61L2/081 (EP,US);
A61L2/087 (EP,US);
A61L24/0073 (EP,US);
A61L2430/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L24/0073, C08L33/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PULVERKOMPONENTE FÜR ZEMENTE ZUM MEDIZINISCHEN GEBRAUCH, DIESE PULVERKOMPONENTE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2001/10] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A POWDER COMPONENT FOR CEMENT FOR MEDICAL USE, USE OF SUCH POWDER COMPONENT AND SUCH POWDER COMPONENT | [2001/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSANT PULVERULENT DESTINE A UN CIMENT D'USAGE MEDICAL, COMPOSANT PULVERULENT ET SON UTILISATION | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1999 | Translation filed | 06.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.02.2005 | [2007/23] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0639382 (MIT PHARMACA AB [SE]); | [A]EP0676212 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [A]EP0701824 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0705609 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) |