Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086546

EP1086546 - METHOD OF SELECTING SYNCHRONIZATION PATTERN FROM A TEST SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2007  [2007/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/08]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / TIMUS, Bogdan
Hagelvägen 10/35
S-976 32 Lulea / SE
 [2006/06]
Former [2001/13]01 / TIMUS, Bogdan
Hagelvägen 10/35
S-976 32 Lule / SE
Representative(s)Mrazek, Werner
Aros Patent AB
P.O. Box 1544
751 45 Uppsala / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]Mrazek, Werner
Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544
751 45 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date99930065.002.06.1999
[2001/13]
WO1999SE00951
Priority number, dateSE1998000202208.06.1998         Original published format: SE 9802022
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9965182
Date:16.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1086546
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1086546
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L7/02, H04H1/00
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES SYNCHRONISATIONSMUSTERS AUS EINEM TESTSIGNAL[2001/13]
English:METHOD OF SELECTING SYNCHRONIZATION PATTERN FROM A TEST SIGNAL[2001/13]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE SELECTIONNER UN MOTIF DE SYNCHRONISATION A PARTIR D'UN SIGNAL D'ESSAI[2001/13]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2001National basic fee paid 
08.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
08.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
07.02.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2005Fee for grant paid
14.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0540808  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US5430485  (LANKFORD DOUGLAS E [US], et al);
 [A]WO9750201  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al);
 [A]EP0714183  (BECKER GMBH [DE])