EP1095037 - PROCESS OF SYNTHESIS OF 5-METHOXY- 2- (4-METHOXY- 3,5-DIMETHYL- 2-PYRIDYL)METHYL|SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/18] | IMPROVED PROCESS OF SYNTHESIS OF 5-METHOXY- 2- (4-METHOXY- 3,5-DIMETHYL- 2-PYRIDYL)METHYL]SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE | ||
[2001/32] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lek, Tovarna Farmacevtskih in Kemicnih Izdelkov, D.D. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Lek, Tovarna Farmacevtskih in Kemicnih Izdelkov, D.D. Verovskova 57 1526 Ljubljana / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAFNER MILAC Natasa Gregorciceva 13a 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 02 /
JEREB, Darja Presernova 46 1235 Radomlje / SI | [2002/16] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
HAFNER MILAČ, Nataša; Gregorčičeva 13a 1000 Ljubljana / SI | ||
02 /
JEREB, Darja; Prešernova 46 1235 Radomlje / SI | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99930107.0 | 12.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999SI00020 | Priority number, date | SI19980000196 | 13.07.1998 Original published format: SI 9800196 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002876 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095037 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095037 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1095037 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07B41/06, A61K31/44 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
C07B41/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 01.02.2001 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 5-METHOXY-2-¬(4-METHOXY-3,5-DIMETHYL-2-PYRYDYL)METHYL|SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOL | [2007/32] | English: | PROCESS OF SYNTHESIS OF 5-METHOXY- 2- (4-METHOXY- 3,5-DIMETHYL- 2-PYRIDYL)METHYL|SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE | [2007/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE DE 5-METHOXY-2- (4-METHOXY-3,5-DIMETHYL-2-PYRIDYL)METHYL|SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/18] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 5-METHOXY-2-[(4-METHOXY-3,5-DIMETHYL-2-PYRYDYL)METHYL]SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOL | ||
Former [2001/18] | IMPROVED PROCESS OF SYNTHESIS OF 5-METHOXY- 2- (4-METHOXY- 3,5-DIMETHYL- 2-PYRIDYL)METHYL]SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE | ||
Former [2001/18] | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE SYNTHESE DE 5-METHOXY-2- (4-METHOXY-3,5-DIMETHYL-2-PYRIDYL)METHYL]SULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2003
ADMISSIBLE AstraZeneca AB c/o Global Intellectual Property, Patents 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2003/11] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 26.02.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.08.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.01.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.01.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.06.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.03.2004 | Appeal received No. T0417/04 | 28.05.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 10.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.2002 | BE | 17.04.2002 | CH | 17.04.2002 | FI | 17.04.2002 | FR | 17.04.2002 | GR | 17.04.2002 | IT | 17.04.2002 | LI | 17.04.2002 | NL | 17.04.2002 | IE | 12.07.2002 | LU | 12.07.2002 | DK | 17.07.2002 | PT | 17.07.2002 | SE | 17.07.2002 | DE | 18.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | MC | 01.02.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/44] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
FI | 17.04.2002 | ||
FR | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
LU | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
MC | 01.02.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
FI | 17.04.2002 | ||
FR | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
LU | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
FI | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
LU | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
LU | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
BE | 17.04.2002 | ||
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
IE | 12.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
PT | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
GR | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
CH | 17.04.2002 | ||
LI | 17.04.2002 | ||
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 17.04.2002 | |
NL | 17.04.2002 | ||
SE | 17.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 17.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US4255431 (JUNGGREN ULF K, et al) [YD] 1 * examples 1,23 *; | [XD]US5386032 (BRAENDSTROEM ARNE E [SE]) [XD] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9828294 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1 * page 6, line 16 - line 28; example 5; claim 15 *; | [YP]WO9908500 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [YP] 1* examples 1,2; claims 6,7 * |