Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083843

EP1083843 - BIOENGINEERED VASCULAR GRAFT SUPPORT PROSTHESES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.07.2016
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORGANOGENESIS INC.
150 Dan Road
Canton, MA 02021 / US
For all designated states
Duke University School of Medicine
University Medical Center
Durham, NC 27710 / US
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / ABRAHAM, Ginger, A.
62 Lake Street
Braintree, MA 02184 / US
02 / CARR, Robert, M., Jr.
289 Vermont Street
West Roxbury, MA 02132 / US
03 / HUYNH, Tam
150 Dan Road
Canton, MA 02021 / US
04 / HAGEN, Per, Otto
1129 Little Creek Road
Durham, NC 27713 / US
05 / DAVIES, Mark
1043 University Avenue
Rochester, NY 14607 / US
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Leonard, Thomas Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]Leonard, Thomas Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2001/12]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date99930144.304.06.1999
[2001/12]
WO1999US12500
Priority number, dateUS19980088198P05.06.1998         Original published format: US 88198 P
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962427
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083843
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/02
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:BIOTECHNISCH HERGESTELLTES GEFÄSSIMPLANTAT[2001/12]
English:BIOENGINEERED VASCULAR GRAFT SUPPORT PROSTHESES[2001/12]
French:PROTHESES VASCULAIRES GREFFEES OBTENUES PAR GENIE BIOMEDICAL[2001/12]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2001National basic fee paid 
04.01.2001Search fee paid 
04.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
30.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2015
16.09.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/32]
07.03.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.01.2006
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.03.2014Request for further processing filed
24.03.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.04.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
24.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200608   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2006
30.06.200709   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2007
30.06.200810   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2008
30.06.201416   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2014
30.06.201517   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9522301  (ORGANOGENESIS, INC) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9810775  (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION; COBB, MARK, A; BADYLAK, STEPHEN, F; ISOM,) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US4956178  (BADYLAK ET AL) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9822158  (COOK BIOTECH, INCORPORATED; MED INSTITUTE, INCORPORATED) [X] 1-5 * example -; claim - *
International search[X]US4863668  ;
 [Y]US5131908