Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1144531

EP1144531 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON BLENDS OF GRAFTED POLYETHYLENES AND NON-GRAFTED POLYETHYLENES AND STYRENE CONTAINING RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/46]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, I-Hwa
2509 Channin Drive
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
 [2001/42]
Representative(s)Morf, Jan Stefan
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]Morf, Jan Stefan
Patentanwälte Abitz und Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Former [2004/46]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Former [2004/16]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Former [2003/17]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2001/42]Jones, Alan John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99930436.318.06.1999
[2001/42]
WO1999US13868
Priority number, dateUS19980089855P19.06.1998         Original published format: US 89855 P
[2001/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9966002
Date:23.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1144531
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999
[2001/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1144531
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09J123/08, C09J151/06, B32B27/32, B32B27/12, // (C09J123/08, 151:06), C09J153:00
[2001/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/42]
TitleGerman:KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN BASIEREND AUF MISCHUNGEN VON GEPFROPFTEN POLYETHYLENEN UND NICHTGEPFROPFTEN POLYETHYLENEN UND STYROLHALTIGEM KAUTSCHUK[2001/42]
English:ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON BLENDS OF GRAFTED POLYETHYLENES AND NON-GRAFTED POLYETHYLENES AND STYRENE CONTAINING RUBBER[2001/42]
French:COMPOSITIONS ADHESIVES A BASE DE MELANGES DE POLYETHYLENES GREFFES ET DE POLYETHYLENE NON GREFFES ET DE CAOUTCHOUC CONTENANT DU STYRENE[2001/42]
MiscellaneousEPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar.
EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available.
EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles.
Entry into regional phase17.11.2000National basic fee paid 
17.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/42]
26.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2004Fee for grant paid
03.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9727259  (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 19 * * page 10, line 27 - line 30 * * page 12, line 12 - line 34 * * examples 4,9-12; table 1 *;
 [Y]EP0405789  (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, line 39 - page 4, line 34 * * page 5, line 21 - line 41; example 14; table 1 *