Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096879

EP1096879 - DISTURBANCE-FREE ELECTROMYOGRAPHIC PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL
2900, Boulevard Edouard-Monpetit Montreal
Quebec H3C 3J7 / CA
[2008/21]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL
2900, Boulevard Edouard-Monpetit
Montreal, Quebec H3C 3J7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SINDERBY, Christer
12750, 27th Avenue
Montreal, Quebec H1A 1Z9 / CA
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Jacobson, Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Jacobson, Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date99930967.716.07.1999
[2001/19]
WO1999CA00652
Priority number, dateCA1998224338216.07.1998         Original published format: CA 2243382
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003637
Date:27.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096879
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096879
Date:21.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0492, A61B5/0488
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:STÖRUNGSFREIE ELEKTROMYOGRAPHISCHE SONDE[2001/19]
English:DISTURBANCE-FREE ELECTROMYOGRAPHIC PROBE[2001/19]
French:SONDE ELECTROMYOGRAPHIQUE DEPOURVUE DE PERTURBATIONS[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase09.02.2001National basic fee paid 
09.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
17.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2007
15.11.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2008Fee for grant paid
04.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
16.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
CY21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
IE16.07.2008
LU16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
GB21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
GR22.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
CY21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
IE16.07.2008
LU16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
GB21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2010/28]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
IE16.07.2008
LU16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
GB21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2010/06]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
IE16.07.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
GB21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/30]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
CH31.07.2008
LI31.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/18]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
MC31.07.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT21.05.2008
BE21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
Former [2009/07]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
ES01.09.2008
Former [2008/49]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
ES01.09.2008
Former [2008/47]ES01.09.2008
Cited inInternational search[A]US4582064  (SORGER) [A] 1,2,4,5,22 * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 42 *;
 [A]US5230786  (SIEMENS) [A] 1,2,4,10,12,20-22 * column 2, line 30 - line 43 *;
 [A]  - KINGMA & AL, "Improved Ag/AgCl pressure electrodes", MEDICAL & BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING & COMPUTING, GB, (198305), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 351 - 357, XP002118744 [A] 1,2,4,10,11,22 * Paragraph 2 : "Mechanical construction" ; figure 2 Paragraph 5 : "Electrical behaviour of the electrodes" ; figure 6 *