Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1090199

EP1090199 - SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung AJ-3
80788 München / DE
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BARTZ, Rüdiger
Connollystrasse 15k
D-80809 München / DE
 [2001/15]
Application number, filing date99931131.922.06.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999EP04308
Priority number, dateDE199812772222.06.1998         Original published format: DE 19827722
[2001/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9967486
Date:29.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1090199
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1090199
Date:19.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05B49/00, G07C9/00
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG[2001/15]
English:SAFETY DEVICE[2001/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2000National basic fee paid 
15.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/15]
19.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2003Fee for grant paid
09.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2309046  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 26; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4440855  (SIMONS OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 29; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4409167  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE19752861  (SAGEM [FR])
by applicantDE4003280