Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096997

EP1096997 - DEALUMINIZED CATALYST CARRIER, METHOD FOR DECREASING THE ALUMINIUM CONTENT OF SAID CATALYST CARRIER AND METHOD FOR HYDRATING C2- OR C3- OLEFINS WITH WATER IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYST CONSISTING OF AN ACID-SATURATED CATALYST CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/19]DEALUMINIZED CATALYST CARRIER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID CATALYST CARRIER AND METHOD FOR HYDRATING C 2? OR C 3? OLEFINS WITH WATER IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYST CONSISTING OF SAID ACID-SATURATED CATALYST CARRIER
[2004/25]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Überseering 40
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2007/18]
Former [2004/47]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
For all designated states
RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Überseering 40
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
Weissfrauenstrasse 9
60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE
For all designated states
RWE-DEA Aktiengesellschaft für Mineraloel und Chemie
Überseering 40
22297 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SAKUTH, Michael
Lipper Weg 193
D-45772 Marl / DE
02 / MASCHMEYER, Dietrich
Wickingstrasse 5 a
D-45657 Recklinghausen / DE
03 / LOHRENGEL, Gregor
Naheweg 3
D-46286 Dorsten / DE
04 / STOCHNIOL, Guido
Langehegge 174
D-45657 Marl / DE
 [2001/19]
Application number, filing date99931210.129.06.1999
[2001/19]
WO1999EP04486
Priority number, dateDE199812974703.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829747
[2001/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001481
Date:13.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096997
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096997
Date:29.12.2004
Language:DE
[2005/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/16, B01J37/10, C07C29/04, B01J37/06
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/19]
TitleGerman:ENTALUMINIERTER KATALYSATORTRÄGER, VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DES ALUMINIUMGEHALTS EINES KATALYSATORTRÄGERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRATISIERUNG VON C2- ODER C3-OLEFINEN MIT WASSER IN GEGENWART EINES KATALYSATORS, DER AUS DIESEM MIT SÄURE GETRÄNKTEM KATALYSATORTRÄGER BESTEHT[2004/25]
English:DEALUMINIZED CATALYST CARRIER, METHOD FOR DECREASING THE ALUMINIUM CONTENT OF SAID CATALYST CARRIER AND METHOD FOR HYDRATING C2- OR C3- OLEFINS WITH WATER IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYST CONSISTING OF AN ACID-SATURATED CATALYST CARRIER[2004/25]
French:SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR DESALUMINE, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DEMINUER LE CONTENU D'ALUMINE DUDIT SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR ET PROCEDE D'HYDRATATION D'OLEFINES C2 OU C3 AVEC DE L'EAU EN PRESENCE D'UN CATALYSEUR COMPOSE DUDIT SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR IMPREGNE D'ACIDE[2004/25]
Former [2001/19]ENTALUMINIERTER KATALYSATORTRÄGER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KATALYSATORTRÄGERS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRATISIERUNG VON C 2?- ODER C 3?-OLEFINEN MIT WASSER IN GEGENWART EINES KATALYSATORS, DER AUS DIESEM MIT SÄURE GETRÄNKTEM KATALYSATORTRÄGER BESTEHT
Former [2001/19]DEALUMINIZED CATALYST CARRIER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID CATALYST CARRIER AND METHOD FOR HYDRATING C 2? OR C 3? OLEFINS WITH WATER IN THE PRESENCE OF A CATALYST CONSISTING OF SAID ACID-SATURATED CATALYST CARRIER
Former [2001/19]SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR DESALUMINE, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE PRODUIRE ET PROCEDE D'HYDRATATION D'OLEFINES C 2? OU C 3? AVEC DE L'EAU EN PRESENCE D'UN CATALYSEUR COMPOSE DUDIT SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR IMPREGNE D'ACIDE
Entry into regional phase24.11.2000National basic fee paid 
24.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/19]
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2004Fee for grant paid
17.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.09.2005   
SÜD-CHEMIE AG
Lenbachplatz 6
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Westendorp, Michael Oliver
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/47]
Opponent(s)01  29.09.2005   
SÜD-CHEMIE AG
Lenbachplatz 6
D-80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Westendorp, Michael Oliver
Patentanwälte Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
08.11.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.04.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
29.04.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB29.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
FR30.06.2006
NL01.01.2007
DE03.01.2007
[2008/23]
Former [2008/18]GB29.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
NL01.01.2007
DE03.01.2007
Former [2007/31]GB29.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
NL01.01.2007
Former [2007/23]NL01.01.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0503229  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0283649  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]);
 [A]GB1306141  (NATIONAL DISTILLERS);
 [DA]DE1156772  (BERGWERKSGESELLSCHAFT HIBERNIA)