EP1086575 - A METHOD FOR SEPARATING NARROWBAND AND BROADBAND SERVICES ON A TRANSMISSION LINK AND A SPLITTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WI-LAN, Inc. 11 Holland Avenue, Suite 608 Ottawa ON K1Y 4S1 / CA | [2010/22] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states WI-LAN Inc. 11 Holland Avenue, Suite 608 Ottawa ON K1Y 4S1 / CA | ||
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELO, Harri Kaivonkatsojantie 5 A 2 FIN-00980 Helsinki / FI | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [2002/42] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Runeberginkatu 5, 10th Floor 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/20] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/13] | Honkanen, Jukka Samuli, et al Patent Agency Compatent Ltd., Pitkänsillanranta 3 B 00530 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 99931284.6 | 10.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999FI00510 | Priority number, date | FI19980001319 | 10.06.1998 Original published format: FI 981319 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965217 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086575 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086575 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H03H17/02 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H03H11/34 (EP,US);
H04B1/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SPLITTERELEMENT ZUR TRENNUNG VON SCHMALBAND- UND BREITBANDDIENSTEN AUF EINER ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNG | [2001/13] | English: | A METHOD FOR SEPARATING NARROWBAND AND BROADBAND SERVICES ON A TRANSMISSION LINK AND A SPLITTER ELEMENT | [2001/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE SERVICES EN BANDE ETROITE ET EN BANDE LARGE DANS UN LIEN DE TRANSMISSION ET ELEMENT SEPARATEUR | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1999 | Translation filed | 03.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | [2011/25] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5623543 (COOK JOHN W [GB]); | [A]US5627501 (BIRAN BERNARD [BE], et al); | [A]WO9720396 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) | [A] - COOK JOHN ET AL., "ADSL and VADSL Splitter Design and Telephony Performance", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, US, (19951201), vol. 13, no. 9, pages 1634 - 1642, XP000543160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.475536 | Examination | US4546212 |