Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099025

EP1099025 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATING THE SURFACE OF A WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
[2001/26]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Valmet Corporation
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / HEIKKINEN, Antti
Kyösti Kallion tie 10 C
FIN-00570 Helsinki / FI
02 / TANI, Mikko
Mikkolantie 4 C 11
FIN-04300 Tuusula / FI
03 / LINNONMAA, Pekka
Sipoontie 6 as. 3
FIN-04400 Järvenpää / FI
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/20]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99931318.222.06.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999FI00546
Priority number, dateFI1998000142922.06.1998         Original published format: FI 981429
[2001/20]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9967466
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099025
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099025
Date:20.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:D21H23/30, D21H25/04
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES BANDES[2001/20]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATING THE SURFACE OF A WEB[2001/20]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE D'UNE BANDE[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase22.06.1999Translation filed 
04.01.2001National basic fee paid 
04.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
04.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
13.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2009Fee for grant paid
11.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.12.2008Request for further processing filed
03.12.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
GB22.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
LU22.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
[2012/43]
Former [2011/35]BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
GB22.06.2010
IE22.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/25]BE20.01.2010
CY20.01.2010
DK20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
IT20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
SE20.01.2010
GR21.04.2010
ES01.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
IE22.06.2010
CH30.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
LI30.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2010/44]FI20.01.2010
NL20.01.2010
ES01.05.2010
PT20.05.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3115958  (KALWAR KLAUS [DE], et al);
 [X]DE4324337  (FAUSEL THOMAS E [DE]);
 [X]US5619927  (WINHEIM STEFAN [DE]);
 [X]EP0464775  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0463213  (HIEDEMANN JEAN GMBH CO KG [DE])
ExaminationUS4653395
by applicantUS4653395
 DE3115958
 DE4324337
 EP0464775