Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1089894

EP1089894 - DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE OF ACCELERATOR DURING THE BRAKING ACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sistema Guida 2000 S.r.l.
Via Casalotti, 34
00166 Roma / IT
For all designated states
Guidsimplex S.n.c. Di Giancarlo Venturini E C.
Via del Podere S. Giusto, 29
00166 Roma / IT
[2001/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SPINNATO, Dario, Sistema Guida 2000 s.r.l.
Via Casalotti, 34
00166 Roma / IT
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Iannone, Carlo Luigi , et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A.
Via Piemonte 26
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Iannone, Carlo Luigi , et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26
00187 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date99931445.325.06.1999
[2001/15]
WO1999IT00190
Priority number, dateIT1998RM0042926.06.1998         Original published format: IT RM980429
[2001/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0000362
Date:06.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1089894
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1089894
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K41/20, G05G9/02
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   PT [2001/15]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN GASPEDALRÜCKNAHME WÄHREND DES BREMSENS[2001/15]
English:DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE OF ACCELERATOR DURING THE BRAKING ACTION[2001/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LIBERATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L'ACCELERATEUR LORS DU FREINAGE[2001/15]
Entry into regional phase25.06.1999Translation filed 
21.12.2000National basic fee paid 
21.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/15]
10.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2002Fee for grant paid
08.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE12.12.2002
PT18.12.2002
[2003/46]
Former [2003/22]PT18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0297671  (VLIET TIMOTHEUS THEODORUS V D) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0139082  (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]AU663460  (MAY, M.C.) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2290509  (WEBBER JILL [GB]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 5 *;
 [A]US5103946  (MASTERS JOHN V [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 38 - line 65 *