Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097251

EP1097251 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING PARTICLES IN EPITAXIAL REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASM America, Inc.
3440 East University Drive
Phoenix, AZ 85034-7200 / US
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / DOLEY, Allan, D.
16015 S. 35 Street
Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US
02 / GOODWIN, Dennis, L.
203 Big Pines Drive
Happy Jack Arizona 86024 / US
03 / O'NEILL, Kenneth
3426 E. Cherokee Street
Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US
04 / VRIJBURG, Gerben
Kraelanswei 22
9215 VZ De Veehoop / NL
05 / RODRIGUEZ, David
6810 Prutzmann 57
Beaumont, Texas 77706 / US
06 / AGGARWAL, Ravinder
819 W. Royal Palms
Gilbert, AZ 85233 / US
 [2002/29]
Former [2001/19]01 / DOLEY, Allan, D.
16015 S. 35 Street
Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US
02 / GOODWIN, Dennis, L.
4268 W. Park Avenue
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
03 / O'NEILL, Kenneth
3426 E. Cherokee Street
Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US
04 / VRIJBURG, Gerben
2710 S. Las Flores
Mesa, AZ 85202 / US
05 / RODRIGUEZ, David
13602 N. 44th Street nr. 208
Phoenix, AZ 85032 / US
06 / AGGARWAL, Ravinder
819 W. Royal Palms
Gilbert, AZ 85233 / US
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99932209.230.06.1999
[2001/19]
WO1999US15070
Priority number, dateUS1998011393410.07.1998         Original published format: US 113934
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003056
Date:20.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097251
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097251
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.01.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/00, C30B23/06
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/19]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM REDUZIEREN VON TEILCHEN IN EINEM EPITAKTISCHEN REAKTOR[2001/19]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING PARTICLES IN EPITAXIAL REACTORS[2001/19]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE PARTICULES DANS DES REACTEURS EIPITAXIAUX[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Search fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
10.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.05.2008Fee for grant paid
01.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)EP08006163.3  / EP1956112
Opposition(s)11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT10.12.2008
FR30.06.2009
GB30.06.2009
[2011/28]
Former [2010/28]FR30.06.2009
GB30.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9714179  (ADVANCED SEMICONDUCTOR MAT [US]) [X] 1,18,21 * page 6, lines 14-28 * [Y] 3,7;
 [Y]US4747367  (POSA JOHN G [US]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9802683  (VERIFLO CORP [US]) [Y] 3 * the whole document *;
 [YA]JPS61272918  ;
 [YA]US5390895  (IWABUCHI TOSHIAKI [JP]) [Y] 7,15 * the whole document * [A] 5;
 [Y]US5092728  (CRABB RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5020475  (CRABB RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 15,21 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5363872  (LORIMER D ARCY H [US]) [A] 15,21 * the whole document *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870421), vol. 0111, no. 27, Database accession no. (E - 501), [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 4
International search[A]US5366557  (YU CHEN-HUA D [US]);
 [A]US5373806  (LOGAR ROGER E [US])
by applicantWO9714179
 US4747367
 WO9802683
 JPS61272918