Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091651

EP1091651 - CONTINUOUS SHOCK WAVE FOOD PROCESSING WITH SHOCK WAVE REFLECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydrodyne R & D Incorporated
Suite 1602, 416 Ponce de Leon Avenue Hato Rey
Puerto Rico 00918 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Hydrodyne R & D Incorporated
Suite 1602, 416 Ponce de Leon Avenue
Hato Rey, Puerto Rico 00918 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LONG, B., John
988 Boulevard of the Arts
Sarasota, FL 34236 / US
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Leone, Mario
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A.
Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Leone, Mario
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra 39
00186 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date99932221.702.07.1999
[2001/16]
WO1999US15110
Priority number, dateUS19980091621P02.07.1998         Original published format: US 91621 P
US19990115610P12.01.1999         Original published format: US 115610 P
US19990126921P29.03.1999         Original published format: US 126921 P
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001242
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091651
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A23B4/015, A23L3/015, A22C9/00
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTINUIERLICHE SCHOCKWELLEN NAHRUNGSMITTELVERARBEITUNG MIT SCHOCKWELLENREFLEKTION[2001/16]
English:CONTINUOUS SHOCK WAVE FOOD PROCESSING WITH SHOCK WAVE REFLECTION[2001/16]
French:TRAITEMENT D'ALIMENTS PAR ONDES DE CHOC CONTINUES AVEC REFLEXION DE CES ONDES[2001/16]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2001National basic fee paid 
25.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
03.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
04.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/36]
Request for further processing for:16.03.2004Request for further processing filed
16.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.04.2004Decision despatched
25.03.2003Request for further processing filed
25.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US5588357  (TOMIKAWA HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - line 67 * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 48 * * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 28 * * claim - *;
 [DA]US5328403  (LONG JOHN B [US]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5273766  (LONG JOHN B [US]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0516080  (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]);
 [PA]WO9838875  (HYDRODYNE INC [US]);
 [PDA]WO9854975  (HYDRODYNE R & D INC [US]);
 [A]US3492688  (GODFREY CHARLES S)