Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076608

EP1076608 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR APPLYING A MEDIUM TO A SUBSTRATE, SYSTEM HAVING A PLURALITY OF SUCH DEVICES, AND USE OF SUCH DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stork Prints B.V.
Raamstraat 3
5831 AT Boxmeer / NL
[2003/15]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
STORK Textile Printing Group B.V.
43a, Wim de Körverstraat
5830 AA Boxmeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / WEFERS, Lothar
Von-der-Tann Strasse 29
D-83022 Rosenheim / DE
02 / JUFFINGER, Josef
Hinterthiersee 131A
A-6335 Thiersee / AT
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Mertens, Hans Victor
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
J.J. Viottastraat 31
1071 JP Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Mertens, Hans Victor
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date99932485.812.02.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999NL00074
Priority number, dateDE199810604013.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19806040
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941081
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076608
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076608
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B41F15/08, B41F15/40
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES MEDIUMS AUF EIN SUBSTRAT, SYSTEM MIT MEHREREN DIESER VORRICHTUNGENUND ANWENDUNG DIESER VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM[2001/08]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR APPLYING A MEDIUM TO A SUBSTRATE, SYSTEM HAVING A PLURALITY OF SUCH DEVICES, AND USE OF SUCH DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM[2001/08]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE SUR UN SUBSTRAT, SYSTEME COMPRENANT PLUSIEURS DE CES DISPOSITIFS ET UTILISATION DE CES DISPOSITIF, PROCEDE ET SYSTEME[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2000National basic fee paid 
11.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
06.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2003Fee for grant paid
31.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Request for further processing for:28.03.2002Request for further processing filed
28.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS63194865  ;
 [A]JPS61238465  ;
 [DA]DE3146828  (KLEINEWEFERS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,43,45,46 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE4001452  (WACO WALZEN KONSTRUKTION SYSTE [DE]) [DA] 1,43,45,46 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE4228177  (WAKO WALZEN KONSTRUKTION SYSTE [DE]) [DA] 1,43,45,46 * abstract *;
 [A]US4188882  (BREUNIG ANTON [DE], et al) [A] * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4436032  (VAN OUWERKERK WOUTER C [DE]) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881209), vol. 012, no. 471, Database accession no. (M - 773), [A] 1,43,45,46 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870312), vol. 011, no. 082, Database accession no. (M - 571), [A] 1,43,45,46 * abstract *
Examination EP0836939