blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1053522 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1053522



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 283
30.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
28.02.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.12.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.12.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
27.12.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
21.09.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
14.09.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.07.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.07.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.07.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
01.05.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.2000 Description Search / examination 5
19.07.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.05.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
02.05.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.01.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.01.2000 Claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.01.2000 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.01.2000 Description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.01.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
21.10.1999 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.10.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
27.09.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.09.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.09.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 62
02.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 50
01.09.1999 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.09.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
01.09.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.08.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.08.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 29
21.06.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
21.06.1999 Urgent incoming letter International Searching Authority 5
20.03.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.03.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 4
20.03.1999 Description International Searching Authority 17
20.03.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
20.03.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 6