blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1053522


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]
28.02.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
08.03.2002 (Expected) grant published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
01.03.2002 Renewal fee
14.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant
18.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.07.2001 First examination report
03.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
06.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
06.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
28.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.2000 Renewal fee
26.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication