blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1053522
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3837289BGlobal Dossier 25.10.2006B2
JP2002503844 05.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US11051898 06.07.1998
US9903121 12.02.1999
US12027598 13.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1053522Global Dossier 24.04.2002B1
EP1053522 22.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11051898 06.07.1998
US9903121 12.02.1999
US12027598 13.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69901338T 12.12.2002T2
DE69901338D 29.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
US11051898 06.07.1998
US9903121 12.02.1999
US12027598 13.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9941659Global Dossier 19.08.1999A1
Priority number Date
US11051898 06.07.1998
US12027598 13.02.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6237083 22.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
US11051898 06.07.1998
US12027598 13.02.1998