Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053522

EP1053522 - MICROPROCESSOR INCLUDING MULTIPLE REGISTER FILES OCCUPYING THE SAME LOGICAL SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[2008/36]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC.
One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FAVOR, John, G.
4400 Woodland Drive
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Picker, Madeline Margaret , et al
Brookes Batchellor
1 Boyne Park
Tunbridge Wells
Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Picker, Madeline Margaret , et al
Brookes & Martin, High Holborn House, 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date99932527.712.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999US03121
Priority number, dateUS1998012027513.02.1998         Original published format: US 120275
US1998011051806.07.1998         Original published format: US 110518
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941659
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053522
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053522
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/30, G06F9/38
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/47]
TitleGerman:MIKROPROZESSOR MIT MEHREREN REGISTERSÄTZEN, DIE DEN GLEICHEN LOGISCHEN RAUM BESITZEN[2000/47]
English:MICROPROCESSOR INCLUDING MULTIPLE REGISTER FILES OCCUPYING THE SAME LOGICAL SPACE[2000/47]
French:MICROPROCESSEUR COMPRENANT DES FICHIERS DE REGISTRES MULTIPLES OCCUPANT LE MEME ESPACE LOGIQUE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2000National basic fee paid 
19.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
11.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2001Fee for grant paid
27.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9722924  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 15, line 6 - line 22 * * page 26, line 10 - page 28, line 10 * * page 30, line 16 - line 25 * * page 40, line 23 - page 41, line 23 * * page 57, line 21 - page 61, line 14 * * page 63, line 8 - line 23 * * page 100, line 11 - page 106, line 22 *;
 [A]US5530817  (MASUBUCHI YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0594240  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL])