Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000455

EP1000455 - FUEL DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/20]
Inventor(s)01 / DOBLER, Klaus
Bettaeckerstrasse 12
D-70839 Gerlingen / DE
02 / HÜBEL, Michael
Lorscher Weg 1
D-70839 Gerlingen / DE
03 / STROHL, Willi
Rieslingstrasse 13
D-71717 Beilstein / DE
[2000/20]
Application number, filing date99932621.805.05.1999
[2000/20]
WO1999DE01342
Priority number, dateDE199812413529.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19824135
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963644
Date:09.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000455
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/14, F04D13/06, F04D5/00, F02M37/08
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/20]
TitleGerman:FÖRDERAGGREGAT FÜR KRAFTSTOFF[2000/20]
English:FUEL DELIVERY SYSTEM[2000/20]
French:GROUPE DE REFOULEMENT POUR CARBURANT[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2000National basic fee paid 
29.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
01.03.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US3500755  (GIBSON WILLIAM H) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 2, line 27 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2976808  (WHITEHURST BERT W) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 21 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5545017  (STROHL WILLI [DE], et al);
 [A]DE4427737  (KOESTER FRIEDRICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [A]DE4036905  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]DE4020521  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])