Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015792

EP1015792 - TORQUE DAMPING DEVICE USING ARTICULATED MOUNTING NOISE-FREE WHEN OPERATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO EMBRAYAGES s.a.s.
5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin
80009 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR
[2003/12]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
VALEO
43, rue Bayen
75017 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BERTIN, Patrice
20, rue Victor Hugo
F-95540 Méry-sur-Oise / FR
02 / LUSSON, Stéphane
92, avenue du Président Wilson
F-92800 Puteaux / FR
03 / TARDIVEAU, Christophe
11, rue Ganneron
F-75018 Paris / FR
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Lemaire, Marc , et al
VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers
93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/30]Lemaire, Marc , et al
VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers
93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR
Former [2000/27]Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Embrayages, Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15 rue des Rosiers
93585 Saint Ouen / FR
Application number, filing date99932914.719.07.1999
[2000/27]
WO1999FR01767
Priority number, dateFR1998000921120.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809211
[2000/27]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005519
Date:03.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015792
Date:05.07.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015792
Date:11.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/134, F16F15/139
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesIT [2003/24]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:TORSIONSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT GELENKEINRICHTUNGEN DIE IN BETRIEB GERÄUSCHLOS SIND[2003/01]
English:TORQUE DAMPING DEVICE USING ARTICULATED MOUNTING NOISE-FREE WHEN OPERATING[2000/27]
French:DISPOSITIF AMORTISSEUR DE TORSION METTANT EN OEUVRE DES MONTAGES A ARTICULATION NE GENERANT PAS DE BRUIT EN FONCTIONNEMENT[2000/27]
Former [2000/27]TORSIONSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT GELENKEINRICHTUNGEN DIE IN BETRIEB GRÄUSCHLOS SIND
Entry into regional phase22.03.2000National basic fee paid 
22.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2003Fee for grant paid
25.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0797024  (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5732604  (LUCIENNE PHILIPPE [FR])