Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020495

EP1020495 - ION COMPLEX, COATING MATERIAL, AND COATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mebiol Inc.
14-4, Yocho-machi, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/32]For all designated states
Mebiol Inc.
14-4, Yocho-machi, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
M & M Laboratory Co., Ltd.
275, Kumano
Enzan-shi, Yamanashi-ken 404 / JP
For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIOKA, Hiroshi
11-1, Shimoochiai
Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 257-0026 / JP
02 / MORI, Yuichi
3-21-2-4, Kamariyaminami, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0045 / JP
03 / KUBOTA, Sunao
3-21-24, Higashi
Kunitachi-shi, Tokyo 186-0002 / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Bibby, William Mark , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Bibby, William Mark , et al
Mathisen, Macara & Co., The Coach House, 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date99933116.827.07.1999
[2000/29]
WO1999JP04021
Priority number, dateJP1998021100827.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21100898
[2000/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0006651
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020495
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020495
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.02.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08L101/00, C09D201/00, A61L33/00, C09D201/02, C09D105/10
[2001/42]
Former International [2000/29]C08L101/00, C09D201/00, A61L33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
Extension statesAL24.03.2000
LT24.03.2000
LV24.03.2000
MK24.03.2000
RO24.03.2000
SI24.03.2000
TitleGerman:ION-KOMPLEX, BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL, UND BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/29]
English:ION COMPLEX, COATING MATERIAL, AND COATING METHOD[2000/29]
French:COMPLEXE IONIQUE, MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT ET PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2000Translation filed 
24.03.2000National basic fee paid 
24.03.2000Search fee paid 
24.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
17.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2004Fee for grant paid
06.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
PT22.02.2005
[2008/18]
Former [2005/46]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/28]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/27]AT22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
ES02.01.2005
Former [2005/21]AT22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS534788  ;
 [X]JPS63119774  ;
 [X]EP0544259  (LIGNYTE CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * claim 1 *;
 [X]JPS60135432
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 09, Database accession no. 1978-16542A, XP002175429 & JPS534788 A 19780117 (MORIROKU SHOJI KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 26, Database accession no. 1988-180719, XP002175430 & JPS63119774 A 19880524 (UBE IND LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851120), vol. 9, no. 293, Database accession no. (C - 315), & JP60135432 A 19850718 (RAION KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 35, Database accession no. 1985-213168 [ ] * abstract *
International search[X]JPS6359966
 [XP]JPH10287711
 [X]JPH08198906
 [X]JPS6475508
 [X]JPS54147696
 [X]JPS63214304
 [X]JPH02298902
 [X]JPH0733682