Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996215

EP0996215 - GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]NO-LOAD GENERATOR
[2003/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kim, Kyung-Soo
3-6-5-201, Shinmei Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-0016 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Kim, Kyung-Soo
3-6-5-201, Shinmei
Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0016 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AN, Jong-Sok
123-4, Hakgok-ri, Dongrae-myun
Chunchen-City, Kangwon-do / KR
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H.
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys.
PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date99933127.528.07.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999JP04042
Priority number, dateJP1998021397629.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21397698
JP1998031622506.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31622598
[2000/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0007284
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996215
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996215
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.02.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02K21/12, H02K21/18, H02K19/22
[2001/37]
Former International [2000/17]H02K21/12
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/17]
TitleGerman:GENERATOR[2003/48]
English:GENERATOR[2003/48]
French:GENERATEUR[2003/48]
Former [2000/17]LEERLAUFGENERATOR
Former [2000/17]NO-LOAD GENERATOR
Former [2000/17]GENERATEUR SANS CHARGE
Entry into regional phase28.01.2000Translation filed 
28.01.2000National basic fee paid 
28.01.2000Search fee paid 
28.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
28.01.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
15.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
09.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2004Fee for grant paid
02.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
ES13.09.2004
[2008/18]
Former [2004/51]CH02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS5686061  ;
 [X]DE1084361  (PAUL ADAM) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 12 - line 17; figures 1-3 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810926), vol. 005, no. 153, Database accession no. (E - 076), [X] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH0943319  (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD);
 [A]JPH09261934  (TAKARA MUNEAKI);
 [AP]JPH1118387  (FUKUNAGA TOSHIO);
 [A]JPS617273U