Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094830

EP1094830 - USE OF COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUBSTANCE WITHIN THE GROUP GnRH-ANALOGUES FOR TREATMENT OF OBSESSIVE-COMPULSIVE DISORDER (OCD) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Läkartjänster I Västsverige AB
P.O. Box 71
427 22 Billdal / SE
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / ERIKSSON, Tomas
P.O. Box 71
S-427 22 Billdal / SE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Cederbom, Hans Erik August , et al
Cegumark AB
Box 53047
400 14 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Cederbom, Hans Erik August , et al
Cegumark AB, Box 53047
400 14 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date99933439.405.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999SE01218
Priority number, dateSE1998000243807.07.1998         Original published format: SE 9802438
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0001403
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1094830
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1094830
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/09, A61P25/00
[2004/49]
Former International [2001/18]A61K38/09
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND ZUMINDEST EIN GNRH-ANALOGES ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZWANGSNEUROTISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2001/18]
English:USE OF COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SUBSTANCE WITHIN THE GROUP GnRH-ANALOGUES FOR TREATMENT OF OBSESSIVE-COMPULSIVE DISORDER (OCD)[2001/18]
French:UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION RENFERMANT AU MOINS UNE SUBSTANCE SELECTIONNEE DANS LE GROUPE DES ANALOGUES DE LA GnRH POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES OBSESSIONELS IMPULSIFS[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2001National basic fee paid 
26.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
14.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2005Fee for grant paid
25.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
CY21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
FR21.09.2005
IT21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/18]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
IT21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/33]BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/22]CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
Former [2006/14]CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI21.09.2005
SE21.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]  - CASA M. ET AL, "Antiandrogenic Treatment of Obsessive-Compulsive Neurons", ACTA PSYCHIATR. SCAND., SPAIN, (1986), vol. 73, pages 221 - 222, XP000863589
ExaminationWO0012115
    Thibaut et al: 'Gonadotrophin hormone releasing hormone agonist in cases of severe paraphilia: a lifetime treatment?', Psychoneuroendocrinology, Vol. 21, Issue 4, May 1996, pages 411-419,