Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1095055 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1095055



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1048
26.02.2013 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
26.02.2013 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
21.02.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
29.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.09.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.09.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.09.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
17.09.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 4
17.09.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.07.2012 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
13.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
25.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
25.01.2012 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
25.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
12.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.01.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.12.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
22.12.2011 Text: Decision / Communication Appeal 44
18.11.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
16.11.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
25.05.2011 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
17.05.2011 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
12.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.04.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.04.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.04.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.04.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.04.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.02.2011 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Appeal 1
21.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.02.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.02.2011 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
14.02.2011 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
10.02.2011 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.01.2011 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
16.06.2010 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
04.03.2010 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
02.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
11.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 33
28.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 34
22.05.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Claims Appeal 1
14.05.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
14.05.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
11.05.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 42
05.03.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.02.2007 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.02.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
23.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
21.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
13.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2007 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.01.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
02.01.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.11.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.09.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
25.09.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
25.09.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.09.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.09.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.07.2006 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
25.07.2006 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
24.07.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.07.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 16
07.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.07.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 1
30.06.2006 Claims Opposition 2
30.06.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
30.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
30.06.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.06.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.06.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.06.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.06.2006 Claims Opposition 9
26.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 14
26.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 15
26.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
26.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.06.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.06.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.06.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 6
21.06.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
20.06.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.06.2006 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
07.06.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
01.06.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2006 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
24.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
19.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
18.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 4
12.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.04.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.04.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.04.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.04.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.04.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 9
23.03.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.01.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
15.03.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
02.03.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
19.01.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.01.2005 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
19.01.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.01.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
07.01.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 3
07.01.2005 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 1
29.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.12.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 4
22.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.2004 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
14.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.12.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 4
08.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.2004 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
08.12.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
08.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
07.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
06.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
06.12.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
02.12.2004 Request for change of name Opposition 5
01.12.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
17.11.2004 Communication concerning signing of documents Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.07.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.07.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.06.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.06.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.06.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 75
09.06.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
09.06.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
09.06.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
09.06.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
03.06.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 25
03.06.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 27
03.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.04.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.04.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
29.04.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
25.04.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 3
11.02.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.02.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
11.02.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
10.12.2002 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
19.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
19.08.2002 Description Search / examination 4
19.08.2002 Description Search / examination 3
19.08.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.08.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.08.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
31.05.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.05.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.03.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.03.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
24.11.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.11.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.07.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.07.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.03.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.01.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.01.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
28.11.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
27.01.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.01.2000 Priority document Search / examination 12
20.01.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.01.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14