Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095367

EP1095367 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY WITH INDEPENDENTLY ADRESSABLE PICTURE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumagraphics, LLC
P.O. Box 158, 309 South Union Sparta
Michigan 49345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/22]For all designated states
Illumagraphics, LLC
P.O. Box 158, 309 South Union
Sparta, Michigan 49345 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Add-Vision, Inc.
1305D Palmetto Avenue
Pacifica, CA 94044 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAYNES, Bryan, D.
1305D Palmetto Avenue
Pacifica, CA 94044 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A.
Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/38]Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20
20135 Milano / IT
Former [2001/18]Checcacci, Giorgio , et al
PORTA, CHECCACCI & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99933505.206.07.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999US12832
Priority number, dateUS1998011562113.07.1998         Original published format: US 115621
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003378
Date:20.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095367
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000
[2001/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/10
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE ANZEIGE MIT UNABHÄNGIGEN ADDRESSIERBAREN BILDELEMENTEN[2001/18]
English:ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY WITH INDEPENDENTLY ADRESSABLE PICTURE ELEMENTS[2001/18]
French:AFFICHAGE ELECTROLUMINESCENT A ELEMENTS D'IMAGES ADRESSABLES INDEPENDAMMENT[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase12.02.2001National basic fee paid 
12.02.2001Search fee paid 
12.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/40]
03.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/43]
24.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5638156  (DEHLI HANS J [US]);
 [A]US5459954  (BRONAUGH WILLIAM R [US], et al);
 [A]US4646079  (KITAI ADRIAN H [US], et al);
 [A]US4897802  (ATKINSON WILLIAM B [US], et al);
 [A]US5598058  (LAPOINTE BRADLEY J [US]);
 [A]US5410217  (LAPOINTE BRADLEY J [US])