Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103069

EP1103069 - MISTED PRECURSOR DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH IMPROVED MIST AND MIST FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Change - designated statespublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYMETRIX CORPORATION
5055 Mark Dabling Boulevard
Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US
For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics Corporation
1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi
Osaka 569-1193 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
SYMETRIX CORPORATION
5055 Mark Dabling Boulevard
Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US
For all designated states
Matsushita Electronics Corporation
1-1, Saiwai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1193 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAYASHI, Shinichiro
2-9-3-301, Nasahara
Takatsuki Osaka 569-1041 / JP
02 / MCMILLAN, Larry, D.
3005 Blodgett Drive
Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US
03 / PAZ DE ARAUJO, Carlos, A.
317 West Sunbird Cliffs Lane
Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date99933710.807.07.1999
[2001/22]
WO1999US15245
Priority number, dateUS1998012805803.08.1998         Original published format: US 128058
[2001/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0008681
Date:17.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103069
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/316
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/22]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG MITTELS EINES NEBELFÖRMIGEN PRECURSORS MIT VERBESSERTEM NEBEL UND NEBELFÜRHUNG[2001/22]
English:MISTED PRECURSOR DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH IMPROVED MIST AND MIST FLOW[2001/22]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DEPOT DE PRECURSEUR EN BROUILLARD ET PROCEDE A BROUILLARD ET ECOULEMENT DE BROUILLARD AMELIORES[2001/22]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2001National basic fee paid 
16.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
04.02.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US5688565  (MCMILLAN LARRY D [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 11, line 20 - column 14, line 6; figure 7 * * column 16, line 25 - line 35 * * column 18, line 18 - line 26; table B * * figure 6; claims 1,15,23 *;
 [X]WO9811603  (SYMETRIX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * page 19, line 14 - page 20, line 5 *