blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1100983 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1100983



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 199
24.08.2005 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.08.2005 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.08.2005 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.06.2005 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
15.03.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.09.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
11.04.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.04.2001 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.03.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2001 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 16
27.02.2001 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
05.02.2001 Claims Search / examination 13
05.02.2001 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.12.2000 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
27.01.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.01.2000 Priority document Search / examination 70
20.01.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
20.01.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 68