blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1100983


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.07.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.08.2005  [2005/33]
09.03.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.08.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2002 Renewal fee
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
06.04.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]
06.04.2001 Request for examination filed published on  23.05.2001 [2001/21]
13.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
07.03.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
31.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
25.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication