blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1100983
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002520489Global Dossier 09.07.2002A
Priority number Date
US9915430 09.07.1999
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1100983Global Dossier 23.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9915430 09.07.1999
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6280582 28.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
US38578199 30.08.1999
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6280583 28.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
US38578499 30.08.1999
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6409892 25.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
US11230098 09.07.1998
US38534299 30.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6428660 06.08.2002B2
US2001020583 13.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US81137901 15.03.2001
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6428662 06.08.2002B1
Priority number Date
US38518599 30.08.1999
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6890415 10.05.2005B2
US2003047448 13.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US81137901 15.03.2001
US11230098 09.07.1998
US16776302 11.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0003067Global Dossier 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW573070B 21.01.2004B
Priority number Date
US11230098 09.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6228232 08.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
US11230098 09.07.1998