Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100983

EP1100983 - REACTOR VESSEL HAVING IMPROVED CUP, ANODE AND CONDUCTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.08.2005  [2005/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEMITOOL, INC.
655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell
Montana 59901 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
SEMITOOL, INC.
655 West Reserve Drive
Kalispell, Montana 59901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOODRUFF, Daniel, J.
409 Northridge Drive
Kalispell, MT 59901 / US
02 / HANSON, Kyle, M.
110 Greenbriar Drive
Kalispell, MT 59901 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Peter
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Hirsch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date99933775.109.07.1999
[2001/21]
WO1999US15430
Priority number, dateUS1998011230009.07.1998         Original published format: US 112300
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0003067
Date:20.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100983
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C25B9/00, C25D17/02, C25D17/06, C25D17/10
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
TitleGerman:REAKTORGEFÄSS MIT VERBESSERTER SCHUTZKAPPE, ANODEN UND LEITERANORDNUNG[2001/21]
English:REACTOR VESSEL HAVING IMPROVED CUP, ANODE AND CONDUCTOR ASSEMBLY[2001/21]
French:RECIPIENT DE REACTEUR COMPORTANT UN ENSEMBLE COUPELLE, ANODE ET CONDUCTEUR AMELIORE[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2001National basic fee paid 
05.02.2001Search fee paid 
05.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/33]
15.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5391285  (LYTLE WILLIAM H [US], et al);
 [Y]DE4114427  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]);
 [Y]US4741624  (BARROYER BERNARD [FR]);
 [Y]US5514258  (BRINKET OSCAR J [US], et al);
 [Y]US5227041  (BROGDEN BRUCE N [US], et al);
 [YP]US5829791  (KOTSUBO VINCENT Y [US], et al);
 [Y]US5024746  (STIERMAN ROGER J [US], et al);
 [Y]US4466864  (BACON DUANE E [US], et al);
 [Y]US3798003  (ENSLEY E, et al);
 [Y]US4585539  (EDSON GWYNNE I [US]);
 [Y]US5169408  (BIGGERSTAFF REX L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5447615  (ISHIDA HIROFUMI [JP]);
 [A]US5441629  (KOSAKI KATSUYA [JP])