Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971832

EP0971832 - WIPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Zimmer, Joachim
Uhlandstrasse 5
77880 Sasbach / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99934208.220.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999DE00113
Priority number, dateDE199810413603.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804136
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9939947
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971832
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/38
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:WISCHBLATT[2000/03]
English:WIPER BLADE[2000/03]
French:LAME D'ESSUIE-GLACE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3969784  (JOURNEE PAUL) [X] 1-4 * column 3, lines 13-25; figures 8-11 * [Y] 5,6;
 [Y]US3060480  (ZIEGLER EUGENE R) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 24; figures 2,4,12 *;
 [YA]GB802388  (CITROEN SA ANDRE) [Y] 6 * page 2, lines 21-40; figure - * [A] 1,4,5;
 [A]EP0756976  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document *