Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990350

EP0990350 - METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS ON A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IP Warehouse, Inc.
Suite 307, 4400 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / PALAGE, Michael, D.
Suite 307, 4400 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
02 / CONA, Frank, A., Jr.
Suite 307, 4400 PGA Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Kidd, Piers Burgess , et al
Marks & Clerk
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Kidd, Piers Burgess , et al
Marks & Clerk, 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2000/14]Kidd, Piers Burgess , et al
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Field
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99934391.623.02.1999
[2000/14]
WO1999US03840
Priority number, dateUS1998002776623.02.1998         Original published format: US 27766
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943167
Date:26.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990350
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q5/00, H04L9/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTISIERUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN DOKUMENTEN AUF EINEM COMPUTERNETZWERK[2000/14]
English:METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS ON A COMPUTER NETWORK[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONIQUES SUR RESEAU INFORMATIQUE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase23.11.1999National basic fee paid 
23.11.1999Search fee paid 
23.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
29.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/18]
16.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4652990  (PAILEN WILLIAM [US], et al);
 [Y]US5666417  (LIANG LOUIS H [US], et al)