Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095218

EP1095218 - INTERNALLY PROFILED STATOR TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
[2007/42]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
4100 Clinton Drive, Building 1, 6th Floor Houston
Texas 77020 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
4100 Clinton Drive, Building 1, 6th Floor
Houston, Texas 77020 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOTTOS, Richard, D.
27831 Krezdorn Road
Hockley, TX 77447 / US
02 / UNDERWOOD, Lance, D.
12806 Marron Court
Cypress, TX 77429 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[2009/36]
Former [2001/18]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99934405.403.06.1999
[2001/18]
WO1999US12562
Priority number, dateUS1998009254405.06.1998         Original published format: US 92544
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9963226
Date:09.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095218
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095218
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.12.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:F04C2/08, F04C2/107
[2004/19]
Former International [2001/18]F04C2/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/18]
TitleGerman:INNEN PROFILIERTES STATORROHR[2001/18]
English:INTERNALLY PROFILED STATOR TUBE[2001/18]
French:TUBE DE STATOR PROFILE A L'INTERIEUR[2001/18]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2000National basic fee paid 
08.12.2000Search fee paid 
08.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
14.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2007Fee for grant paid
28.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27]
Request for further processing for:07.04.2005Request for further processing filed
07.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1592149  (GEBRUDER NETSCH MACHINENFABRIK) [X] 1-7 * page 4, lines 11-19; figure 3 *;
 [X]FR2299533  (SIGMA LUTIN [CS]) [X] 1-4,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2155827  (SIGMA LUTIN) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE2713468  (ALLWEILER AG) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4454745  (CUDINI IVANO G [CA]) [X] 11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4622840  (DIFFENDERFER HAROLD R [US], et al) [X] 11 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5171138  (FORREST JOHN [US]);
 [X]US5221197  (KOCHNEV ANATOLY M [SU], et al);
 [X]US832001  (STASCH EMIL R [US]);
 [X]US1605828  ;
 [X]US5400636  (BAILEY KENNETH S [US]);
 [Y]US4415316  (JUERGENS RAINER [DE]);
 [Y]US4336702  (AMADO JR JUAN J);
 [Y]US629245  (FRANK SALOMON [DE]);
 [A]US5145342  (GRUBER HEINZ [DE]);
 [A]US5145343  (BELCHER IAN R [GB]);
 [A]AU491586B
by applicantUS4676725
 US5171138